Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Marsh, Mark A, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Hemming, Katherine L, Nitsche, Gary S, against Nab Motel, Inc. D B A Fairview Inn, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUTLER, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 09, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE SETTLED DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 2, 2022 CASE SETTLED |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 3, 2022 LETTER FROM GARY S. NITSCHE, P.A. TO THE HONORABLE JUDGE BUTLER ADVISING OF RESOLUTION AND EXPECTATION TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL SHORTLY ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67891694 LETTER |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HELD DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 2, 2022 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 25, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: BUTLER, CHARLES E BRIEFING LETTER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67756915 LETTER |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 16, 2022 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO BE HEARD AT THE CONVENIENCE OF THE COURT EXHIBIT A TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT EXHIBIT B TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT EXHIBIT C TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: VMT TRANSACTION ID: 67729092 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 4, 2022 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR SETTING HEARING DATE FOR MONDAY, JUNE 20, 2022 AT 10:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: AQ TRANSACTION ID: 67689763 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 2, 2022 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF; WITHDRAWING THE APPEARANCE OF KATHERINE L. HEMMING, ESQ AND ENTERING THE APPEARANCE OF JAMES GASPERO, ESQ. ACCEPTED BY: AQ TRANSACTION ID: 67675835 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 1, 2022 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO AMEND THE TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER ACCEPTED BY: AQ TRANSACTION ID: 67674131 STIPULATION |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 2, 2022 LETTER TO THE HONORABLE JUDGE BUTLER FROM GARY S. NITSCHE, P.A., DATED MAY 31, 2021, PROVIDING A CURRENT STATUS UPDATE IN THE MATTER. ACCEPTED BY: AQ TRANSACTION ID: 67674246 LETTER |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: MAY 14, 2022 NOTICE OF THE DEPOSITION OF THE PLAINTIFF, VIA ZOOM, SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 2, 2022 AT 2:00 P.M., WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED ACCEPTED BY: AQ TRANSACTION ID: 67614109 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.