Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jacobs, Jared, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mowrey, Douglass L, Sharma, Aman K, against Swanson, Jaelyn Nicole, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUTLER, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 17, 2018 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
COURT DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JULY 31, 2021 SIGNED ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66810883 ORDER SIGNED/GRANTED (MISC) |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JULY 31, 2021 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: E TRANSACTION ID: 66806785 NOTICE |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JULY 8, 2021 30- DAY LETTER TO COUNSEL REQUESTING A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL BE FILED WITHIN 30 DAYS ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66744582 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE SETTLED DATE DOCKETED: JULY 7, 2021 CASE SETTLED |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 20, 2021 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR SETTING HEARING DATE FOR TUESDAY, JULY 6, 2021 AT 5:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66614135 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 10, 2021 JAF FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL HEARD ON WED., JAN., 27, 2021 AT 9:00A.M. - MOTION TO COMPEL-GRANTED ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66321967 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 30, 2021 SIGNED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S DEPOSITION, TO COMPEL HER AFFIDAVIT TO INTERROGATORIES AND FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66296162 ORDER |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 29, 2021 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT JAELYN NICOLE SWANSON ON FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 5, 2021 AT 2 P.M. AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66289433 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 28, 2021 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION ELECTRONICALLY SERVED ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66287799 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 28, 2021 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, JARED JACOBS TO BE TAKEN ON FEB. 5, 2021 AT 4 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66287799 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.