Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Castillo, Manuel, filed a(n) Issuance Subpoena case against 3 M Co Inc, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, UNASSIGNED NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDGE, UNASSIGNED NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryIssuance Subpoena |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
SIMULTANEOUS DISPOSED WITH FILING DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 10, 2017 ONE SUBPOENA ISSUED TO OWENS CORNING FIREBOARD ASBESTOS PI TRUST WILMINGTON TRUST CORP. WILMINGTON, DE ON JANUARY 4, 2017 ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 60041950 SIMULTAEOUS DISPOSED W/ FILING |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MISCELLANEOUS - ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 10, 2017 PETITION FOR ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA FILED CONVENTIONALLY IN NCC PROTHONOTARY ON DECEMBER 29, 2016 ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 60041950 MISC-ISSUANCE OF A SUBPOENA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.