Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Leischner, Herman, filed a(n) Issuance Subpoena case against Hobart Brothers Co Inc, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, UNASSIGNED NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDGE, UNASSIGNED NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryIssuance Subpoena |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - PROOF OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 13, 2017 SERVED COMBUSTION ENGINEERING 524 (G) ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST ON 12-21-2016. ACCEPTED BY: AMF TRANSACTION ID: 60061239 SUBPOENA - PROOF OF SERVICE |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MISCELLANEOUS - ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 31, 2016 PETITION FOR ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA FILED CONVENTIONALLY IN NCC PROTHONOTARY ON DECEMBER 16, 2016 ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 60010527 MISC-ISSUANCE OF A SUBPOENA |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
SIMULTANEOUS DISPOSED WITH FILING DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 31, 2016 ONE SUBPOENA ISSUED TO COMBUSTION ENGINEERING 524(G) ASBESTOS PI TRUST WILMINGTON TRUST SP SERVICES WILMINGTON, DE ON DECEMBER 19, 2016 ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 60010527 SIMULTAEOUS DISPOSED W/ FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.