Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Weygandt, Rosalinda, filed a(n) Issuance Subpoena case against Ameron International Corporation, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, UNASSIGNED NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDGE, UNASSIGNED NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2016 |
CategoryIssuance Subpoena |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
SIMULTANEOUS DISPOSED WITH FILING DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 7, 2016 ONE SUBPOENA ISSUED TO CELOTEX ASB. SETTLEMENT TRUST, CARE OF DELAWARE CLAIMS PROCESSING FACILITY, LLC, WILMINGTON, DE ON SEPTEMBER 1, 2016. ACCEPTED BY: VRR TRANSACTION ID: 59518112 SIMULTAEOUS DISPOSED W/ FILING |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MISCELLANEOUS - ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 7, 2016 PETITION FOR ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA FILED CONVENTIONALLY WITH NCC PROTHONOTARY ON AUGUST 31, 2016. ACCEPTED BY: VRR TRANSACTION ID: 59518112 MISC-ISSUANCE OF A SUBPOENA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.