Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Us Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Conway, Daniel T, Thompson, Melanie J, against Smith, Cassandra L, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with WALLACE, PAUL R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWALLACE, PAUL R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 12, 2017 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: DB TRANSACTION ID: 61099388 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
September 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 13, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY: WALLACE, PAUL R SO ORDERED (VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE) ACCEPTED BY: DB TRANSACTION ID: 61102583 ORDER |
|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING MORTGAGE MEDIATION RECORD DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 22, 2017 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD (CONTINUING CONFERENCE) - THE PLAINTIFF WILL SEEK TO DISMISS THE FORECLOSURE ACTION UPON EXECUTION OF SUCH DOCUMENTS BY FILING A NOTICE OR STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OR BY MOVING THE COURT FOR DISMISSAL, AS APPROPRIATE, NO LATER THAN 60 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF SUCH EXECUTION. ACCEPTED BY: DB TRANSACTION ID: 60501521 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING MORTGAGE MEDIATION RECORD DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 21, 2017 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD (INITIAL CONFERENCE) - AN ADDITIONAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 19, 2017 AT 2:00 PM. ACCEPTED BY: DB TRANSACTION ID: 60357212 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD |
|
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE MEDIATION FEE PAYMENT NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 23, 2017 MEDIATION FEE PAYMENT NOTICE ACCEPTED BY: DB TRANSACTION ID: 60240867 MEDIATION FEE PAYMENT NOTICE |
|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 19, 2017 MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE. MEDIATION CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 15, 2017 AT 3:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: DB TRANSACTION ID: 60224784 MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE |
|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE MEDIATION CERTIFICATE OF PARTICIPATION (NO FEE) DATE DOCKETED: **ODP_GENERAL_DATE_DDMONYYY CERTIFICATE OF PARTICIPATION - DEFENDANT ELECTS TO PARTICIPATE. ROSA RIVERA, HOUSING COUNSELOR. ACCEPTED BY: DB TRANSACTION ID: 60090448 CERTIFICATE PARTICIPATION PA |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 25, 2017 PERSONALLY SERVED 01-17-2017 17:28 CASSANDRA L SMITH ACCEPTED BY: DB TRANSACTION ID: 60084918 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 12, 2017 (1) WRIT ISSUED ON 01-10-2017 ACCEPTED BY: DB TRANSACTION ID: 60057930 WRIT ISSUED |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE MEDIATION DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 4, 2017 INIT FILING MORTGAGE MEDIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.