Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Delaware Division Of Revenue, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Black, Edward K, against Washington, Akeem, Washington, Latoya, represented by Black, Edward K, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2016 |
CategoryDivision Of Revenue Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 4, 2017 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - LATOYA WASHINGTON ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 60015687 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
DIVISION OF REVENUE TAX WARRANT FILED DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 16, 2016 TAX WARRANT - LATOYA WASHINGTON ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 59566344 TAX WARRANT FILED |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 1, 2016 DIVISION OF REVENUE JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 59495793 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DIVISION OF REVENUE (DOR) SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 1, 2016 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: LATOYA WASHINGTON AKEEM WASHINGTON JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JOINT AND SEVERAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT $1392.49 INIT FILING DIV OF REVENUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.