Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Murphy, Daniel C, filed a(n) Ccld: Complex Com Lit Division case represented by Andrade, Sarah T, Brauerman, Steve B, Carpenter, Harrison S, Darby, Johnna M, Denn, Matthew P, (total of 16) See All against Halbower Holdings Inc, Halbower Holdings, Inc., Halbower, Matthew C., Pentwater Capital Management Lp, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JOHNSTON, MARY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHNSTON, MARY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryCcld: Complex Com Lit Division |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 1, 2022 LETTER TO APPELLANT COUNSEL ADVISING THAT THE SUPERIOR COURT APPEAL PREPARATION FEE IS NOW DUE. ACCEPTED BY: AK TRANSACTION ID: 68009267 LETTER |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE APPEALED TO SUPREME COURT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 31, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: JOHNSTON, MARY M NOTICE OF APPEAL TO SUPREME COURT FROM THE ORDER DATED 7-22-22 IN THE SUPERIOR COURT BY JUDGE JOHNSTON, IN C.A. NO. N16C-12-433 MMJ [CCLD], WITH DESIGNATION OF NO FURTHER TRANSCRIPT. ACCEPTED BY: OA TRANSACTION ID: 67983350 CASE APPEALED TO SUPREME COURT |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 31, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: JOHNSTON, MARY M LETTER DATED 8-29-22 FROM SENIOR COURT CLERK TO PROTHONOTARY, ADVISING THAT THE RECORD IS DUE 9-21-22. ACCEPTED BY: OA TRANSACTION ID: 67983350 LETTER |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 26, 2022 SO ORDERED: EMAIL FROM THE HONORABLE JUDGE JOHNSTON REGARDING THE RELEASE OF TRANSCRIPT TO COUNSEL AND NON PARTY PETITIONER ARTHUR KAZ ON JULY 21, 2022 ACCEPTED BY: OA TRANSACTION ID: 67973145 ORDER |
|
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 10, 2022 PUBLIC VERSION OF NON-PARTY ARTHUR KAZS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS OBJECTION TO THE SEALING OF THE JURY VERDICT PUBLIC VERSION OF EXHIBIT B TO NON-PARTY ARTHUR KAZS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS OBJECTION TO THE SEALING OF THE JURY VERDICT CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO THE PUBLIC VERSION OF NON-PARTY ARTHUR KAZS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS OBJECTION TO THE SEALING OF THE JURY VERDICT ACCEPTED BY: OA TRANSACTION ID: 67910943 RESPONSE |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
TRANSCRIPT FILED DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 4, 2022 TRIAL TRANSCRIPT HELD ON APRIL 13, 2022, BEFORE THE HONORABLE JUDGE MARY M. JOHNSTON. ACCEPTED BY: OA TRANSACTION ID: 67891847 TRANSCRIPT FILED |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: JULY 22, 2022 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM FOR MOTION TO OBJECTION TO THE SEALING OF THE JURY VERDICT HEARD BEFORE THE HONORABLE JUDGE JOHNSTON ON JULY 20, 2022 ACCEPTED BY: OA TRANSACTION ID: 67846151 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JULY 16, 2022 LETTER TO THE HONORABLE MARY J. JOHNSTON FROM THOMAS A. UEBLER, ESQUIRE ENCLOSING TWO COURTESY COPIES OF 1) NON-PARTY ARTHUR KAZS WRITTEN NOTICE OF HIS OBJECTION TO THE SEALING OF THE JURY VERDICT AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS, AND 2) NON-PARTY ARTHUR KAZS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS OBJECTION TO THE SEALING OF THE JURY VERDICT AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS ACCEPTED BY: OA TRANSACTION ID: 67822487 LETTER |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE DATE DOCKETED: JULY 12, 2022 (UNDER SEAL) NON-PARTY ARTHUR KAZS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS OBJECTION TO THE SEALING OF THE JURY VERDICT EXHIBIT A TO NON-PARTY ARTHUR KAZS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS OBJECTION TO THE SEALING OF THE JURY VERDICT (UNDER SEAL) EXHIBIT B TO NON-PARTY ARTHUR KAZS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS OBJECTION TO THE SEALING OF THE JURY VERDICT CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO EXHIBIT A TO NON-PARTY ARTHUR KAZS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS OBJECTION TO THE SEALING OF THE JURY VERDICT ACCEPTED BY: OA TRANSACTION ID: 67804847 RESPONSE |
|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JULY 7, 2022 PUBLIC VERSION OF NON-PARTY ARTHUR KAZ'S WRITTEN NOTICE OF HIS OBJECTION TO THE SEALING OF THE JURY VERDICT) WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) ACCEPTED BY: MR TRANSACTION ID: 67790917 NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.