Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mccreary, David S, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Silverman, Michael I, Connors, Kevin J, Cobb, Nancy C, Ransom, Donald M, Weik, Joseph W, (total of 5) See All against U S R P I Llc, Us Lawns Of Delaware, Eagle Property Services Llc, Usrp I Llp, About Time Snow, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JURDEN, JAN R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJURDEN, JAN R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 8, 2018 ORDER SIGNED BY: JURDEN, JAN R SO ORDERED (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL) ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 61662091 ORDER |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 2, 2018 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 61634110 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 10, 2018 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 12, 2017 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR SETTING HEARING DATE FOR WEDNESDAY, DECEMBER 27, 2017 AT 10:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 61228067 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 1, 2017 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FROM DONALD M. RANSOM, ESQUIRE, TO MICHAEL I. SILVERMAN, ESQUIRE AND ADRIENNE M. MCDONALD, ESQUIRE, ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT ABOUT TIME SNOW AND FHG COMPANIES ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 60663651 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 8, 2017 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITHDRAWING KEVIN J. CONNORS, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT FHG COMPANIES TA ABOUT TIME SNOW AND ENTERING THE APPEARANCE OF DONALD M. RANSOM, ESQ. ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT FHG COMPANIES TA ABOUT TIME SNOW CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 60443835 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 8, 2017 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF IN THE LAW OFFICE OF CHRISSINGER AND BAUMBERGER ON JUNE 21, 2017 AT 2:00 P.M. WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 60440941 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 21, 2017 NOTICE OF SERVICE FOR ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT USRP I, LLC'S INTERROGATORIES AND RESPONSES TO USRP I, LLC'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DIRECTED TO THE PLAINTIFF ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 60357966 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 4, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY: JURDEN, JAN R TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: OCTOBER 15, 2018 AT 9:00 A.M. & TRIAL: NOVEMBER 12, 2018 AT 9:30 A.M. (5 DAYS) ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 60288209 SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 3, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY: JURDEN, JAN R SO ORDERED (STIPULATION AND ORDER (PROPOSED) TO AMEND CAPTION TO REFLECT USRP I, LLC AS PROPER NAMED DEFENDANT) ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 60282883 ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.