Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Reynard, Chuck, Reynard, Nicole, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Wetzel Iii, Benjamin C, Freibott, Frederick S, against Fest, Kathleen, Lyons, Marcus Cain, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with CARPENTER JR., WILLIAM C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARPENTER JR., WILLIAM C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MAY 11, 2017 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL, SO ORDERED BY CARPENTER, J. ON 5-8-17. ACCEPTED BY: AMR TRANSACTION ID: 60586997 ORDER |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: MAY 9, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF BENJAMIN C. WETZEL, III, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS LYONS AND FEST AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: AMR TRANSACTION ID: 60568664 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MAY 9, 2017 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - JUDGE'S SIGNATURE REQUIRED ACCEPTED BY: AMR TRANSACTION ID: 60568704 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 21, 2017 THIS LETTER IS CONFIRMATION THAT THE COURT HAS BEEN NOTIFIED THE PARTIES HAVE SETTLED THIS MATTER. IN ORDER FOR THE COURT TO CLOSE ITS FILE A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL MUST BE FILED WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS LETTER OR THE COURT WILL DISMISS THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. ACCEPTED BY: AMR TRANSACTION ID: 60497719 LETTER |
|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 21, 2017 LETTER TO JUDGE CARPENTER FROM FREDERICK S. FREIBOTT, ESQUIRE ADVISING THAT THIS MATTER RESOLVED AND A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WILL BE FILED IN THE NEAR FUTURE. ACCEPTED BY: AMR TRANSACTION ID: 60498610 LETTER |
|
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 23, 2017 LETTER TO JUDGE CARPENTER FROM FREDERICK S. FREIBOTT, ESQUIRE ADVISING THAT THE MEDIATION HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, APRIL 11, 2017 AT 8 AM AND NOT ON MARCH 1, 2017 AS STATED IN MY PREVIOUS LETTER. ACCEPTED BY: AR TRANSACTION ID: 60241450 LETTER |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 19, 2017 LETTER TO JUDGE CARPENTER ADVISING THAT THE MEDIATION HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 1, 2017 AT 6:30 P.M. WITH YVONNE SAVILLE, ESQUIRE ACCEPTED BY: MKT TRANSACTION ID: 60227761 LETTER |
|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 17, 2017 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR SETTING HEARING DATE FOR TUESDAY, APRIL 11, 2017 AT 8:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 60223358 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT FILED DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 19, 2017 AFFIDAVIT TO BE ATTACHED TO PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES ACCEPTED BY: AK TRANSACTION ID: 60083748 AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 19, 2017 PERSONALLY SERVED 01-17-2017 12:17 KATHLEEN FEST ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 60085284 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.