Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wingate, Kevin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Wernle Jr., Paul A, against Seidle, James Arthur, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with WHARTON, FERRIS W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHARTON, FERRIS W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 2, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY: WHARTON, FERRIS W SO ORDERED (PLAINTIFF'S VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL JUDGE SIGNATURE REQUIRED) ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 60667203 ORDER |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 2, 2017 PLAINTIFF'S VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL JUDGE SIGNATURE REQUIRED ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 60664831 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 4, 2017 (1) WRIT ISSUED ON 2-2-2017 ACCEPTED BY: JLQ TRANSACTION ID: 60160551 WRIT ISSUED |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 4, 2017 COMPLAINT PRAECIPE-LONG ARM SUMMONS-LONG ARM FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES RULE 3H STATEMENT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT ACCEPTED BY: ELS TRANSACTION ID: 60005291 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PERSONAL INJURY AUTO DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 4, 2017 INIT FILING PERS INJURY AUTO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.