Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Long Jr, Paul D, Long, Valerie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Martin, Timothy S, Marques, Christopher S, Desantis, Michael K, Krayer, Nicholas M, against Jung, Floride Browning, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with SCOTT JR, CALVIN L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCOTT JR, CALVIN L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
COURT DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 30, 2018 ORDER SIGNED BY: SCOTT, CALVIN L SO ORDERED - COURT DISMISSAL (CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER REQUESTING THAT A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL BE FILED WITHIN 30 DAYS) ACCEPTED BY: VMT TRANSACTION ID: 61621720 COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 15, 2017 CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER REQUESTING THAT A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL BE FILED WITHIN 30 DAYS ACCEPTED BY: VMT TRANSACTION ID: 61355360 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE SETTLED DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 14, 2017 CASE SETTLED |
|
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 31, 2017 PLAINTIFFS' RULE 26(B)(4) DISCLOSURE OF DR. FRANCIS DR. FRANCIS' REPORT ACCEPTED BY: VMT TRANSACTION ID: 61291688 DISCOVERY |
|
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 31, 2017 PLAINTIFFS' RULE 26(B)(4) DISCLOSURE OF DR. WOO DR. WOO'S REPORT ACCEPTED BY: VMT TRANSACTION ID: 61291688 DISCOVERY |
|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 7, 2017 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR SETTING HEARING DATE FOR FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 10, 2017 AT 8:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: VMT TRANSACTION ID: 61207270 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 28, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY: SCOTT, CALVIN L SO ORDERED (STIPULATION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT JUNG'S EXPERT DEADLINES) ACCEPTED BY: VMT TRANSACTION ID: 61161828 ORDER |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 26, 2017 STIPULATION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT JUNG'S EXPERT DEADLINES ACCEPTED BY: VMT TRANSACTION ID: 61143730 STIPULATION |
|
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 18, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY: SCOTT, CALVIN L SO ORDERED (PARTIAL STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AGAINST RYAN C. KIELHORN IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.) ACCEPTED BY: MKT TRANSACTION ID: 60995631 ORDER |
|
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
PARTIAL DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 17, 2017 PARTIAL STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AGAINST RYAN C. KIELHORN IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 60738878 PARTIAL DISMISSAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.