Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Pitzl, Ramona, Pitzl, Richard G, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Balick, Adam L, Bowers Ii, Allen D, Bradley, Paul A, Dalton, Andrew C, Dalton, Bartholomew J, (total of 24) See All against Air & Liquid Systems Corp, C B S Corp, Certainteed Corp, Deere & Co, Defense Coordinating Counsel, (total of 17) See All in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, ASBESTOS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDGE, ASBESTOS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2016 |
CategoryAsbestos |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED/GRANTED (MISCELLANEOUS CASES) DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 20, 2019 ORDER SIGNED/GRANTED (MISC) |
|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 8, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE) ACCEPTED BY: TNW TRANSACTION ID: 64072275 ORDER |
|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
OMNIBUS MOTION DATE DOCKETED: JULY 4, 2019 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE, TO BE PRESENTED TO THE COURT AT THE NEXT OMNIBUS MOTION HEARING ON AUGUST 8, 2019. PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE ACCEPTED BY: AK TRANSACTION ID: 63506352 OMNIBUS MOTION |
|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
OMNIBUS MOTION DATE DOCKETED: MAY 9, 2019 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE. NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE, TO BE INCLUDED ON THE JUNE 20, 2019 OMNIBUS AGENDA PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE. ACCEPTED BY: AK TRANSACTION ID: 63244148 OMNIBUS MOTION |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 3, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER (GRANTING DEFENDANT PFIZER INC.'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS BASED UPON DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)) ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 63123905 ORDER |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 26, 2019 DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES INC.'S WITNESS & EXHIBIT LISTS ACCEPTED BY: ASA TRANSACTION ID: 63097325 WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 12, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS LLC'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS BASED UPON PLAINTIFFS' CHOICE NOT TO OPPOSE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 63049759 ORDER |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 9, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC BASED UPON PLAINTIFFS' DECISION NOT TO OPPOSE SUMMARY JUDGMENT) ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 63047484 ORDER |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 9, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., INCORRECTLY NAMED AS AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS WHOLLY-OWNED SUBSIDIARY OF AMPCO-PITTSBURGH CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BUFFALO PUMPS , OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS BASED UPON PLAINTIFFS CHOICE NOT TO OPPOSE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 63047024 ORDER |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 8, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS BASED UPON PLAINTIFF'S DECISION NOT TO OPPOSE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION) ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 63039873 ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.