Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Vega, Albert, filed a(n) Transfer From Ccp case against Tue Estate, Jonathan Thea, represented by Greenberg, Robert M, Longobardi Iii, Joseph J, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with MEDINILLA, VIVIAN L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMEDINILLA, VIVIAN L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2016 |
CategoryTransfer From Ccp |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 17, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY: MEDINILLA, VIVIAN L SO ORDERED BY MEDINILLA, J. ON AUGUST 16, 2017. (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL) ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 60993243 ORDER |
|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 16, 2017 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL, JUDGE'S SIGNATURE REQUIRED ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 60980556 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 12, 2017 CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER: A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OR A LETTER STATING THE STATUS OF THIS MATTER MUST BE FILED WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS LETTER OR THE COURT WILL DISMISS THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 60972799 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
STATUS REPORT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 8, 2017 STATUS REPORT. SUCCESSFUL MEDIATION. MATTER SETTLED: FINALIZING DETAILS. DISMISSAL FORTHCOMING. ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 60949004 STATUS REPORT |
|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 29, 2017 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR SETTING HEARING DATE FOR WEDNESDAY, JUNE 21, 2017 AT 3:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: LAT TRANSACTION ID: 60530111 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - PROOF OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 23, 2017 DEFENDANT THEA TUE'S SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED UPON THE CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR CHRISTIANA CARE HEALTH SYSTEM FOR A RECORDS ONLY DEPOSITION SCHEDULED TO TAKE PLACE ON MARCH 2, 2017 AT 10:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: LAT TRANSACTION ID: 60239040 SUBPOENA - PROOF OF SERVICE |
|
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 17, 2017 DEFENDANT ESTATE OF THEA TUE'S NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF THE CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR CHRISTIANA CARE HEALTH SYSTEM FOR MARCH 2, 2017 AT 10:00 A.M. DEFENDANT THEA TUE'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ITS NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF THE CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR CHRISTIANA CARE HEALTH SYSTEM FOR MARCH 2, 2017 AT 10:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: LAT TRANSACTION ID: 60216062 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 14, 2017 NOTICE OF THE DEPOSITION OF THE PLAINTIFF SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 23, 2017 AT 1:00 P.M., WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED ACCEPTED BY: LAT TRANSACTION ID: 60068596 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 29, 2016 DEFENDANT ESTATE OF THEA THUE'S LETTER TO THE HONORABLE VIVIAN L. MEDINILLA WITHDRAWING ITS MOTION TO COMPEL SCHEDULED TO BE PRESENTED TO THE COURT ON NOVEMBER 29, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: LAT TRANSACTION ID: 59877172 LETTER |
|
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 24, 2016 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES ACCEPTED BY: LAT TRANSACTION ID: 59872223 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.