Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Global Aerospace Inc, filed a(n) Ccld: Complex Com Lit Division case represented by Bifferato Jr., Vincent A, Edwards, Philip T, Maimone, Michael J, Moody, Robin P, Shields, Colleen D, (total of 5) See All against Devries, Shelly, Mcdowell, Carol, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JOHNSTON, MARY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHNSTON, MARY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2016 |
CategoryCcld: Complex Com Lit Division |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 24, 2018 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 62585084 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
October 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE SETTLED DATE DOCKETED: JULY 24, 2019 CASE SETTLED |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 1, 2018 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DAVID NELSON SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 26, 2018 AT 1:00 P.M. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DAVID NELSON ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 62401820 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 1, 2018 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DAVID CHIPPERSON SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 24, 2018 AT 9:30 A.M. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DAVID CHIPPERSON ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 62401713 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 1, 2018 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF LAURA MCGINN SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 24, 2018 AT 3:00 P.M. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF LAURA MCGINN ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 62401825 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 1, 2018 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF ROD MILTON SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 26, 2018 AT 3:00 P.M. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF ROD MILTON ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 62401793 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 1, 2018 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF TRACEY CAMPBELL SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 24, 2018 AT 1:30 P.M. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF TRACEY CAMPBELL ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 62401772 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 1, 2018 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF THOMAS KOPACZ SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 24, 2018 AT 11:30 A.M. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF THOMAS KOPACZ ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 62401753 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 1, 2018 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF SHARON HOLAHAN SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 26, 2018 AT 9:30 A.M. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF SHARON HOLAHAN ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 62401742 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 29, 2018 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA AD TESTIFICANDUM AND DUCES TECUM ISSUED TO MICHAEL FORTUNATO TO TAKE HIS ORAL DEPOSITION ON SEPTEMBER 25, 2018, FILED ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF, GLOBAL AEROSPACE, INC. SUBPOENA AD TESTIFICANDUM AND DUCES TECUM ISSUED TO MICHAEL FORTUNATO PURSUANT TO DELAWARE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SEC. 45 ET SEQ AND NEW JERSEY RULE 4:11-4 (NO COMMISSION REQUIRED) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA AD TESTIFICANDUM AND DUCES TECUM ISSUED TO MICHAEL FORTUNATO ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 62389166 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.