Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gonzalez, Milagros A filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with LEGROW, ABIGAIL M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLEGROW, ABIGAIL M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryIndustrial Accident Board |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
COURT DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MAY 4, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY LEGROW, J. ON MAY 3, 2017 PURSUANT TO RULE 107(F) THIS CASE IS DISMISSED. ACCEPTED BY: STS TRANSACTION ID: 60551301 COURT DISMISSAL |
|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FILED DATE DOCKETED: MAY 3, 2017 RETURNED POSTAGE - FDBN TO APPELLANT RETURN TO SENDER, UNCLAIMED, UNABLE TO FORWARD. ACCEPTED BY: STS TRANSACTION ID: 60545171 RECEIPT FILED |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL DELINQUENT BRIEF NOTICE SENT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 29, 2017 FINAL DELINQUENT BRIEF NOTICE SENT TO APPELLANT ON MARCH 28, 2017. IF NO FURTHER ACTION OF RECORD IS TAKEN WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS NOTICE THE COURT WILL DISMISS THIS CASE. ACCEPTED BY: ELS TRANSACTION ID: 60395754 FINAL DELINQUENT BRIEF NOTICE |
|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 28, 2017 LETTER DATED FEBRUARY 27, 2017 FROM E. SHERKEY TO APPELLANT RE: REPRESENTATION ACCEPTED BY: ELS TRANSACTION ID: 60259175 LETTER |
|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
BRIEF SCHEDULE FILED AND ISSUED AS FOLLOWS: OPENING BRIEF DUE: ANSWERING BRIEF DUE: REPLY BRIEF DUE: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 28, 2017 BRIEF SCHEDULE ISSUED AS FOLLOWS: OPENING BRIEF: MARCH 20, 2017, ANSWERING BRIEF: APRIL 10, 2017, REPLY BRIEF: APRIL 24, 2017 ACCEPTED BY: ELS TRANSACTION ID: 60259126 BRIEF SCHEDULE FILED |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
RECORD AND TRANSCRIPT FROM: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 26, 2017 RECORD AND TRANSCRIPT FROM INDUSTRIAL ACCIDENT BOARD FILED CONVENTIONALLY IN NCC PROTHONOTARY ON FEBRUARY 21, 2017 ACCEPTED BY: ELS TRANSACTION ID: 60255883 RECORD & TRANSCRIPT (LOWER CT) |
|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 15, 2017 SERVED INDUSTRIAL ACCIDENT BOARD BY LEAVING UPON CAROL DILL, RECEPTIONIST, ON 2/8/2017 AT 10:41 A.M. WITH COPY OF CITATION ON APPEAL. ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 60187983 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 9, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY: LEGROW, ABIGAIL M 2 WRITS ISSUED. US MAIL TO MACY'S ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 60183534 WRIT ISSUED |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING INDUSTRIAL ACCIDENT BOARD APPEAL DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 13, 2017 NOTICE OF APPEAL - I.A.B. PRO SE FILED CONVENTIONALLY IN THE NCC PROTHONOTARY ON 12-30-16 CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE FOR SERVICE CITATION ON APPEAL WRIT EXHIBITS TO NOTICE OF APPEAL ACCEPTED BY: LDL TRANSACTION ID: 60062479 INIT FILING IAB APPL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.