Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
T & J Investors, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rhodunda Jr., William J, against First Federal Savings & Loan Association Of Delaware Nka Ocw, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, UNASSIGNED NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDGE, UNASSIGNED NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryCompel Satisfaction Mortgage |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED/GRANTED (MISCELLANEOUS CASES) DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 21, 2016 ORDER SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER VAVALA ON 4-15-16. ACCEPTED BY: DSC TRANSACTION ID: 58892386 ORDER SIGNED/GRANTED (MISC) |
|
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 23, 2016 EMAILED SERVED 02-18-2016 12:00 NEW CASTLE WEEKLY PUBLISHED IN THE NEW CASTLE WEEKLY ON 2-24-16; 3-2-16;3-9-16; AND 3-16-16. ACCEPTED BY: DSC TRANSACTION ID: 58744948 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 8, 2016 (1) WRIT ISSUED ON 2-18-16 TO OCWEN FEDERAL BANK BY PUBLICATION FOR 4 SUCCESSIVE WEEKS ACCEPTED BY: DSC TRANSACTION ID: 58676401 WRIT ISSUED |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION REMOVED FROM CALENDAR - SHERIFF'S OFFICE WAS UNABLE TO GET SERVICE OUT IN TIME. TO BE REISSUED. DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 17, 2016 MOTION REMOVED FROM CALENDAR |
|
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 1, 2016 ORDER FOR RULE TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED BY STREETT, J. ON 2-16-16 RETURNABLE 4-15-16 AT 1:30 PM. ACCEPTED BY: DSC TRANSACTION ID: 58644831 ORDER |
|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 2, 2016 ORDER FOR RULE TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED BY CARPENTER, J. ON 1-12-16 RETURNABLE 3-4-16 AT 1:30 PM. ACCEPTED BY: DSC TRANSACTION ID: 58503355 ORDER |
|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 2, 2016 (1) WRIT ISSUED ON 1-13-16 FOR PUBLICATION ACCEPTED BY: DSC TRANSACTION ID: 58503412 WRIT ISSUED |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MISCELLANEOUS - SATISFY MORTGAGE DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 31, 2015 PETITION TO COMPEL SATISFACTION OF MORTGAGE PRAECIPE EXHIBIT A TO PETITION TO COMPEL SATISFACTION OF MORTGAGE EXHIBIT B TO PETITION TO COMPEL SATISFACTION OF MORTGAGE EXHIBIT C TO PETITION TO COMPEL SATISFACTION OF MORTGAGE EXHIBIT D TO PETITION TO COMPEL SATISFACTION OF MORTGAGE AFFIDAVIT OF WILLIAM J. RHODUNDA, JR. PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF RULE TO SHOW CAUSE PROPOSED FORM OF RULE TO SHOW CAUSE- RTSC SUMMONS PROPOSED FINAL ORDER CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 58354846 MISC-SATISFY MORTGAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.