We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Closed Robert Newt V. Cbs Corp., Et Al.

Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago ago

On December 31, 2015 a Issuance Subpoena case was filed by Newt, Robert, represented by against C B S Corp, represented by in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE.

Case Details

Filing Date

December 31, 2015

Last Refreshed

November 17, 2021

Filing Location

New Castle County, DE

Judge

JUDGE, UNASSIGNED NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Issuance Subpoena

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event SIMULTANEOUS DISPOSED WITH FILING DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 1, 2016 ONE SUBPOENA ISSUED TO FEDERAL MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST, CARE OF WILMINGTON TRUST CORP., WILMINGTON, DE ON DECEMBER 10, 2015. ACCEPTED BY: VRR TRANSACTION ID: 58363963
SIMULTAEOUS DISPOSED W/ FILING
Docket Event INITIAL FILING MISCELLANEOUS - ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 1, 2016 PETITION FOR ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA FILED CONVENTIONALLY WITH NCC PROTHONOTARY ON DECEMBER 9, 2015. ACCEPTED BY: VRR TRANSACTION ID: 58363963
MISC-ISSUANCE OF A SUBPOENA
See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.