Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Us Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Conway, Daniel T, Thompson, Melanie J, against Levins, Daniel R, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JOHNSTON, MARY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHNSTON, MARY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 8, 2017 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 60947482 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
41E NOTICE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JULY 27, 2017 LETTER - 41E NOTICE ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 60902230 41E NOTICE LETTER |
|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL MORTGAGE MEDIATION RECORD DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 28, 2016 FINAL MEDIATION RECORD (SUBSEQUENT CONFERENCE) - THE PARTIES AGREE THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL NOT SEEK DEFAULT JUDGMENT BEFORE JANUARY 23, 2017. ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 59989734 FINAL MEDIATION RECORD |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE MEDIATION RE-SCHEDULING NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 22, 2016 MEDIATION RE-SCHEDULING NOTICE. AN ADDITIONAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR DECEMBER 21, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 59858823 MEDIATION RE-SCHEDULING NOTICE |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING MORTGAGE MEDIATION RECORD DATE DOCKETED: JULY 13, 2016 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD (CONTINUING CONFERENCE) - THE PARTIES HAVE AGREED TO A TRIAL MORTGAGE MODIFICATION, WHICH MUST BE VERIFIED BEFORE ANY JUDGMENT. PLAINTIFF WILL SEEK TO DISMISS THE FORECLOSURE ACTION UPON THE CONVERSION OF THE TRIAL MODIFICATION TO A PERMANENT MODIFICATION BY FILING A NOTICE OR STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OR BY MOVING THE COURT FOR DISMISSAL, AS APPROPRIATE, NO LATER THAN 60 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF SUCH CONVERSION. ACCEPTED BY: MKT TRANSACTION ID: 59248930 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD |
|
May 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING MORTGAGE MEDIATION RECORD DATE DOCKETED: MAY 12, 2016 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD (CONTINUING CONFERENCE) - AN ADDITIONAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR JULY 6, 2016 AT 9:00 AM. ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 58962144 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING MORTGAGE MEDIATION RECORD DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 8, 2016 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD (INITIAL CONFERENCE) - AN ADDITIONAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR MAY 4, 2016 AT 9:00 AM; MEDIATION FEE: DUE BUT NOT PAID. ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 58672700 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 27, 2016 MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE. AN ADDITIONAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 2, 2016 AT 12:30 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 58479312 MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 15, 2016 PERSONALLY SERVED 01-12-2016 09:53 DANIEL R LEVINS ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 58423885 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 3, 2016 (1) WRIT ISSUED ON JANUARY 8, 2016 ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 58654838 WRIT ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.