Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bac Home Loans Servicing Lp, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing Llp, Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Charlton, Janet Z, against Venable, Kerry, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with WHARTON, FERRIS W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHARTON, FERRIS W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 1, 2016 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - WITHOUT PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: JLQ TRANSACTION ID: 58791703 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING MORTGAGE MEDIATION RECORD DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 25, 2016 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD (INITIAL CONFERENCE) - AN ADDITIONAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 6, 2016 AT 12:30 PM. ACCEPTED BY: JLQ TRANSACTION ID: 58763535 CONTINUING MEDIATION RECORD |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 19, 2016 MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE. MEDIATION IS SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 16, 2016 AT 12:30 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: JLQ TRANSACTION ID: 58591441 MEDIATION SCHEDULING NOTICE |
|
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 23, 2016 PERSONALLY SERVED 01-21-2016 12:10 KERRY VENABLE ACCEPTED BY: JLB TRANSACTION ID: 58459173 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 15, 2016 (1) WRIT ISSUED ON 1-12-2016 ACCEPTED BY: JLQ TRANSACTION ID: 58430793 WRIT ISSUED |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE MEDIATION DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 31, 2015 INIT FILING MORTGAGE MEDIATION |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 31, 2015 COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE SCI.FA. EXHIBIT A - NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE MEDIATIONS EXHIBIT B - CERTIFICATE OF PARTICIPATION EXHIBIT C - UNIVERSAL INTAKE FORM EXHIBIT D - FORECLOSURE INTERVENTION CHECK-LIST EXHIBIT E - MORTGAGE EXHIBIT F - ASSIGNMENT EXHIBIT G - ASSIGNMENT EXHIBIT H - ASSIGNMENT EXHIBIT I - ASSIGNMENT EXHIBIT J - ASSIGNMENT EXHIBIT K - FAIR DEBT EXHIBIT L - AFFIDAVIT ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 58354574 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.