Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
New Castle County, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Hay Esq, Laura T, against Galvin, Kathy L, Galvin, Robert L, Galvin Robert L & Kathy L Estate, Tax Parcel No 09 02820 029, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryMonitions Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 5, 2016 JUDGMENT SATISFIED ON 2-4-2016 ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 58525512 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
POWER OF ATTORNEY FROM DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 5, 2016 SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT PRACIPE MONITION ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 58521443 POWER OF ATTORNEY FILED |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 10, 2016 POSTED SERVED 01-07-2016 10:59 ROBERT L GALVIN, KATHY L GAVIN AND OR THE ESTATE OF ROBERT L GALVIN AND KATHY L GALVIN AND TAX PARCEL NO 09-028.20-029 ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 58398580 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 5, 2016 WRIT ISSUED SENT TO SHERIFF ON 1-6-16 ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 58367416 WRIT ISSUED |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 1, 2016 MONITION PRACIPE EXHIBIT-TAX DETAIL ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 58362208 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MONITIONS SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 1, 2016 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED JOINT AND SEVERAL AGAINST: ROBERT L GALVIN KATHY L GALVIN GALVIN ROBERT L & KATHY L ESTATE TAX PARCEL NO 09 02820 029 JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $15017.81 INIT FILING MONITIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.