Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
State Of Delaware, filed a(n) General Labor - Labor and Employment case represented by Gilliam-Johnson, Secretary Of Labor Patrice, against Aeon Labs Llc, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryDepartment Of Labor Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Labor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 14, 2018 DOL JUDGMENT SATISFIED ON 9-13-18 ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 62449130 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 15, 2016 DOMESTIC RETURN RECEIPT ON 1-14-2016 ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 58429909 NOTICE |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 1, 2016 DEPARTMENT OF LABOR LETTER MAILED ON 12-31-2015 ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 58361999 LETTER |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 31, 2015 CERTIFICATE OF INDEBTEDNESS FILED. JUDGEMENT AMOUNT $7445.63 ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 58355700 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DEPARTMENT OF LABOR SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 31, 2015 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: AEON LABS LLC JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $7445.63 INIT FILING DEPART OF LABOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.