Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
M & T Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by White, David A, against Flowpay Corp, Jones, James M, Steiger, Robert Wayne, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with PARKINS JR., JOHN A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKINS JR., JOHN A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryDebt / Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: MAY 18, 2019 RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM IN AID OF EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT EXHIBIT A TO RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM IN AID OF EXECUTION ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 63275070 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: MAY 3, 2019 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM IN AID OF EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT WITH ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM IN AID OF EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: KZ TRANSACTION ID: 63220086 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 16, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY: PARKINS, JOHN LEFT VM WITH DAVID A WHITE, ESQ TO LET HIM KNOW THE REQESTED EXEMPLIFIED COPY WAS READY FOR PICK-UP IN JUDGMENTS ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 62863220 NOTICE |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER FOR COPY OF EXEMPLIFIED JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 11, 2019 LETTER DATED JANUARY 10, 2019 FROM DAVID A. WHITE, ESQ. TO SUSAN A. HEARN REQUESTING AN EXEMPLIFIED COPY OF THE JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 62849423 MISC-EXEMPLIFIED JUDGMENT |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 12, 2016 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: JAMES M JONES FLOWPAY CORP ROBERT WAYNE STEIGER JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: FLOWPAY CORPORATION - COUNT I (IN PERSONAM) $416105.94 TOTAL $306,554.89 ROBERT WAYNE STEIGER AND JAMES M. JONES - COUNT II (IN PERSONAM) - JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY TOTAL $109,551.05 TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT= $416105.94 PLAINTIFF'S DIRECTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 58838694 DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT FILED DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 12, 2016 AFFIDAVIT ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 58838694 AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 18, 2016 REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 02-10-2016 15:00 FLOWPAY CORPORATION ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 58579087 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 12, 2016 PERSONALLY SERVED 02-10-2016 17:07 JAMES M JONES ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 58562085 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBITS DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 12, 2016 SUMMONS WITH RETURN OF SERVICE AS TO ROBERT WAYNE STEIGER PURSUANT TO 10 DEL. C. SECTION 3104 ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 58560991 EXHIBITS |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT FILED DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 12, 2016 AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING PURSUANT TO 10 DEL. C. SECTION 3104 EXHIBITS A AND B TO AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING PURSUANT TO 10 DEL. C. SECTION 3104 ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 58560991 AFFIDAVIT FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.