Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Adams, Deborah Nicole, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Segletes Iii, Theodore J, Dillon, Timothy A, against Brooks, Carlton Stuart, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with MEDINILLA, VIVIAN L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMEDINILLA, VIVIAN L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
none. COURT DISMISSAL |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 6, 2018 ORDER SIGNED BY: MEDINILLA, VIVIAN L SO ORDERED (STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL REMOVING ALL CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT WITH PREJUDICE - CASE MAY BE REMOVED FROM THE COURT'S DOCKET - JUDGE SIGNATURE REQUIRED) ACCEPTED BY: TTC TRANSACTION ID: 62412852 ORDER |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE SETTLED DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 5, 2018 CASE SETTLED |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE SETTLED IN APRIL OF 2018 DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 5, 2018 CASE SETTLED |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 6, 2018 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL REMOVING ALL CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT WITH PREJUDICE - CASE MAY BE REMOVED FROM THE COURT'S DOCKET - JUDGE SIGNATURE REQUIRED ACCEPTED BY: TTC TRANSACTION ID: 62412582 STIPULATION |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 6, 2018 LETTER INFORMING COUNSEL TO FILE A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHIN 30 DAYS OR THE COURT MAY DISMISS IT ACCEPTED BY: TTC TRANSACTION ID: 62412204 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 1, 2018 DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE FOR OFFER OF JUDGMENT TO PLAINTIFF ACCEPTED BY: CTM TRANSACTION ID: 61740124 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 20, 2018 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR SETTING HEARING DATE FOR FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 9, 2018 AT 1:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: AK TRANSACTION ID: 61584156 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 19, 2018 ORDER SIGNED BY: MEDINILLA, VIVIAN L SO ORDERED (JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND THE TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER) ACCEPTED BY: AMQ TRANSACTION ID: 61575772 ORDER |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 13, 2018 JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND THE TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER ACCEPTED BY: VMT TRANSACTION ID: 61560263 STIPULATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.