Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
M&T Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by White, David A, against Stellini, Judy L, Stears, Cynthia M, Sweeny, Lisa V, Wilson-Gossert, Jeremy B, Gossert Jr, Dennis L, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with WALLACE, PAUL R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWALLACE, PAUL R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryDebt / Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 24, 2016 ORDER SIGNED BY: WALLACE, PAUL R SO ORDERED (NOTICE OF DISMISSAL) ACCEPTED BY: DB TRANSACTION ID: 59873592 ORDER |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 23, 2016 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: DB TRANSACTION ID: 59865948 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
41E NOTICE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 27, 2016 41E LETTER SENT ON 10-26-2016 ACCEPTED BY: DB TRANSACTION ID: 59749563 41E NOTICE LETTER |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 4, 2016 NON EST INVENTUS DENNIS L. GOSSERT, JR ON 02-29-2016 07:17. NOTES: DEPUTY ATTEMPTED BUT WAS UNSUCCESSFUL IN SERVING THE SERVEE WITHIN THE ALLOTTED TIME FRAME. ACCEPTED BY: PLR TRANSACTION ID: 58643556 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 4, 2016 NON EST INVENTUS JEREMY B. WILSON-GOSSERT ON 02-29-2016 07:17. NOTES: DEPUTY ATTEMPTED BUT WAS UNSUCCESSFUL IN SERVING THE SERVEE WITHIN THE ALLOTTED TIME FRAME. ACCEPTED BY: PLR TRANSACTION ID: 58643557 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 21, 2016 PERSONALLY SERVED NICHOLAS F. STELLINI, II ON 02-12-2016 14:17 ACCEPTED BY: PLR TRANSACTION ID: 58581552 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 21, 2016 ALTERNATE AGENT SERVED JUDY L. STELLINI BY LEAVING WITH NICHOLAS STELLINI, HUSBAND, ON 02-12-2016 14:17 ACCEPTED BY: PLR TRANSACTION ID: 58581553 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 13, 2016 ALTERNATE AGENT SERVED MICHAEL A. STEARS BY LEAVING WITH CYNTHIA STEARS, WIFE, ON 02-09-2016 10:24 ACCEPTED BY: PLR TRANSACTION ID: 58562465 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 13, 2016 PERSONALLY SERVED CYNTHIA M. STEARS AKA CYNTHIA M. BURRIS ON 02-09-2016 10:24 ACCEPTED BY: PLR TRANSACTION ID: 58562468 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 11, 2016 PERSONALLY SERVED RICHARD A SWEENY ON 02-08-2016 18:09 ACCEPTED BY: PLR TRANSACTION ID: 58547093 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.