Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Akgoren, Emin A, Akgoren, Lindsey M, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Skiles, Nicholas E, Fredricks, Joel H, Desantis, Michael K, Mcgivney Esq, Eileen M, against Pender, James Ray, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with DIANE CLARKE STREETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDIANE CLARKE STREETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MAY 9, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY: STREETT, DIANECLARKE SO ORDERED (STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) ACCEPTED BY: TEB TRANSACTION ID: 60567197 ORDER |
|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MAY 4, 2017 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: TEB TRANSACTION ID: 60544873 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE SETTLED DATE DOCKETED: MAY 3, 2017 CASE SETTLED |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
SO NOTED DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 19, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY: STREETT, DIANECLARKE SO NOTED (PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL'S INTERIM STATUS REPORT TO THE HONORABLE DIANE CLARKE STREETT ADVISING THAT THE CASE HAS SETTLED) ACCEPTED BY: TEB TRANSACTION ID: 60355167 SO NOTED |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 19, 2017 LETTER CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL, AND LETTER FROM PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE HAS SETTLED FILED ON 03-17-2017 ACCEPTED BY: TEB TRANSACTION ID: 60354960 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 19, 2017 PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL'S INTERIM STATUS REPORT TO THE HONORABLE DIANE CLARKE STREETT ADVISING THAT THE CASE HAS SETTLED ACCEPTED BY: TEB TRANSACTION ID: 60349179 LETTER FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW |
|
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 28, 2017 DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION NOTICE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: TEB TRANSACTION ID: 60129104 ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 4, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY: STREETT, DIANECLARKE SO ORDERED (SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND THE TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER) ACCEPTED BY: TEB TRANSACTION ID: 60012277 ORDER |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 31, 2016 SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND THE TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER ACCEPTED BY: TEB TRANSACTION ID: 60007355 STIPULATION |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 29, 2016 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS' SECOND INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT AND PLAINTIFFS' SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT ACCEPTED BY: TEB TRANSACTION ID: 59999021 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.