Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bayview Manor Maintenance Corp, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Fornias Iii, Edward J, against Dominick Jr, Edward, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 13, 2014 |
CategoryJustice Of The Peace Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 19, 2015 SHERIFF SALE ATTEMPTED 06-12-2015 12:00 EDWARD DOMINICK, JR ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 57424630 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MAY 16, 2015 LEVY SERVED 03-04-2015 12:57 EDWARD DOMINICK, JR ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 57245615 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: MAY 5, 2015 WRIT ISSUED SENT TO SHERIFF ON 5-6-15 ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 57178023 WRIT ISSUED |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: VEND EX (VENDITIONI EXPONAS) DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 29, 2015 VEND EX PRAECIPE INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 57148965 VEND EX (VENDITIONI EXPONAS) |
|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 19, 2015 WRIT ISSUED SENT TO SHERIFF ON 2-20-15 ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 56791315 WRIT ISSUED |
|
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: ATTACHMENT FI FA DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 12, 2015 LEVY PRAECIPE ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANT TO PERMIT THE LEVY ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 56755756 ATTACHMENT FIFA |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION GRANTED BY COMMISSIONER MANNING ON 1-9-15 DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 9, 2015 MOTION GRANTED |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 11, 2015 ORDER SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER MANNING ON 1-9-15 GRANTING MOTION ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 56581365 ORDER |
|
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 7, 2014 RE-NOTICE OF MOTION ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 56425979 NOTICE |
|
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
EVENT CONTINUED / RESCHEDULED DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 5, 2014 EVENT CONTINUED / RESCHEDULED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.