Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kidwell, Rachel, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Fornias Iii, Edward J, Clark, Delia A, Grubb, Lisa M, against Food Lion Llc, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with STREETT, DIANE C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTREETT, DIANE C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 13, 2013 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 14, 2015 STIPULATION OF DISMISSASL ACCEPTED BY: PLR TRANSACTION ID: 57062842 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 21, 2015 IF A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL, OR A LETTER STATING THE STATUS OF THIS MATTER, IS NOT FILED WITH THE COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS LETTER, THE COURT WILL DISMISS THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. ACCEPTED BY: PLR TRANSACTION ID: 56806151 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 19, 2015 SO ORDERED BY STREETT, J. ON FEBRUARY 18, 2015 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF FAMILY COURT RECORDS AND NO OPPOSITION: GRANTED. ACCEPTED BY: LCF TRANSACTION ID: 56794028 ORDER |
|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 19, 2015 CLERK'S JUDICIAL WORKSHEET FROM WEDNESDAY, FEBRUARY 18, 2015 SO ORDERED BY STREETT, J. ON FEBRUARY 18, 2015 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF FAMILY COURT RECORDS AND NO OPPOSITION: GRANTED. ACCEPTED BY: LCF TRANSACTION ID: 56794028 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
|
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 6, 2015 RESCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR SETTING HEARING DATE FOR THURSDAY, FEBRUARY 19, 2015 AT 5:30 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: LCF TRANSACTION ID: 56718402 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL SCHEDULED FOR: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 4, 2015 MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF FAMILY COURT RECORDS NOTICE OF MOTION EXHIBITS A-C PROPOSED ORDER CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: LCF TRANSACTION ID: 56707668 MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 25, 2014 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR SETTING HEARING DATE FOR TUESDAY, FEBRUARY 3, 2014 AT 12:00 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: JAB TRANSACTION ID: 56236053 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
April 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 27, 2014 NOTICE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: JAB TRANSACTION ID: 55353724 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 17, 2014 DEFT.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINT TO ATTEND NEWLYSSCHEDULED IME GRANTED. DEFT.'S MOTION FOR PLAINTIFF TO PAY COSTS OF MISSSED IME APPOINTMENT PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED WAS GRANTED BUT WITH A REDUCED AMOUNT OF $250.00. ORDER SIGNED BY STREETT, J. ON 04-16-2014 ACCEPTED BY: RAM TRANSACTION ID: 55311646 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
|
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 17, 2014 SIGNED ORDER GRANTING DEFT.'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION FOR PLAINT. TO REIMBURSE FOR COSTS OF MISSED IME APPOINTMENT. ACCEPTED BY: RAM TRANSACTION ID: 55311646 ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.