Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Citimortgage Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Aulgur Jr., Robert T, Hatfield, Lisa R, against Bartoshesky, Theodore H, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with STREETT, DIANE C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTREETT, DIANE C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryMortgage |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 2, 2011 OCT 28, 2011 SHERIFF RETURNED WRT OF POSESSION EVICTION AS TO THEODORE H BARTOSHESKY 10-25-11 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 40668219 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 22, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: STREETT, DIANECLARKE WRIT ISSUED WRIT OF POSSESSION ON 9-21-2011 SENT CERT COPY OF ORDER TO SHERIFF'S OFFICE ON 9-21-2011 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 39932337 WRIT ISSUED |
|
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ON ROBERT T AULGUR JR. DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 16, 2011 WRIT OF POSSESSION PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 39809070 WRIT OF POSSESSION |
|
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 12, 2011 SO ORDERED RULE TO SHOW CAUSE BY JUDGE STREETT ON 9-7-2011; GRANTED, NO OPPOSITION ACCEPTED BY: JAB TRANSACTION ID: 39732583 ORDER |
|
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 12, 2011 RULE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARD BEFORE JUDGE STREETT ON 9-7-2011 IN COURTROOM 8E; GRANTED ACCEPTED BY: JAB TRANSACTION ID: 39732583 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
|
August 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 13, 2011 WRIT RETURNED SERVING THEODORE H BARTOSHESKY BY LEAVING WITH JESSICA, WIFE ON 8-9-2011 ACCEPTED BY: JAB TRANSACTION ID: 39249522 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 12, 2011 RULE TO SHOW CAUSE SUMMONS SENT TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE ON THEODORE H. BARTOSHESKY. ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 39222896 WRIT ISSUED |
|
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE STREETT ON AUGUST 4, 2011 RETURNABLE ON 9-7-11 AT 9:15 A.M. DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 10, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: STREETT, DIANECLARKE SO ORDERED (ORDER FOR RULE TO SHOW CAUSE) ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 39148075 ORDER |
|
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ON ROBERT T AULGUR JR. DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 3, 2011 WRIT OF POSSESSION ORDER FOR RULE TO SHOW CAUSE PRAECIPE RULE TO SHOW CAUSE ACCEPTED BY: JAB TRANSACTION ID: 39025978 WRIT OF POSSESSION |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JULY 21, 2011 LEV FAC: SOLD TO PLAINTIFF ON 5-10-11. RETURNED FILED IN OUR OFFICE ON 6-29-11. ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 38782941 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.