We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. V. Arlivia G. Howard

Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago ago

On December 29, 2010 a Mortgage case was filed by Wells Fargo Bank Na, represented by Aulgur Jr., Robert T, against Howard, Arlivia G, represented by in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE.

Case Details

Filing Date

December 29, 2010

Last Refreshed

November 16, 2021

Filing Location

New Castle County, DE

Judge

CARPENTER JR., WILLIAM C Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Mortgage

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event TRANSFER TO JUDGMENTS - FULL DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 6, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: CARPENTER, WILLIAM C -- ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 36866819
TRANSFER TO JUDGMENTS: FULL
Docket Event DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 2, 2011 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: ARLIVIA G HOWARD JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: TOTAL DEBT DUE $89421.43 YOU ARE ALSO DIRECTED TO INCLUDE IN THE JUDGMENT INTEREST TO DATE OF CONFIRMATION, LATE CHARGES TO DATE OF CONFIRMATION, ESCROW ADVANCES TO DATE OF CONFIRMATION, COUNSEL FEES AS PROVIDED IN THE MORTGAGE, COSTS, AND ALL OTHER SUMS NOW DUE OR THAT MAY BE BECOME DUE UNDER THE MORTGAGE. TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT= $89421.43 DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST ARLIVIA G. HOWARD AFFIDAVIT OF ROBERT T. AULGUR, ESQ. AFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS (PROOF OF MAILING) (RULE 4F4) ACCEPTED BY: CCM TRANSACTION ID: 36808064
DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Docket Event WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 2, 2011 SERVED ARLIVIA HOWARD PERSONALLY ON 1-21-11. ACCEPTED BY: CCM TRANSACTION ID: 35690675
WRIT RETURN (GENERIC)
Docket Event WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 16, 2011 1 WRIT ISSUED JANUARY 14 2011 ACCEPTED BY: LM TRANSACTION ID: 35399756
WRIT ISSUED
Docket Event INITIAL FILING MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 30, 2010
INIT FILING MORTGAGE
Docket Event INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 30, 2010 FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT PRAECIPE SUMMONS CIS SHEET EXHIBIT A EXHIBIT B ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 35096253
INITIAL COMPLAINT
See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.