Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Chase Home Finance Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Aulgur Jr., Robert T, Miller, Chase N, Thompson, Melanie J, against Mattinson, Dennis G, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with SCOTT JR, CALVIN L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCOTT JR, CALVIN L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2010 |
CategoryMortgage |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 19, 2018 SHERIFF SALE SERVED 10-10-2017 10:00 DENNIS G MATTINSON ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 61583433 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 17, 2017 SHERIFF SALE SERVED 10-10-2017 10:00 DENNIS G MATTINSON ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 61245093 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS OF SHERIFF'S SALE AND PROOF OF POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69 (G) FILED DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 7, 2017 PROOF OF MAILING- RULE 69 (G) NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS EXHIBITS ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 61206690 CIVIL RULE 69 (G) |
|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 9, 2017 1ST PLURIES WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS ISSUED, WITH CHECK SENT TO NCC SHERIFF ON 8-10-2017 ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 60956384 WRIT ISSUED |
|
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 2, 2017 WRIT 1ST PLURIES PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 60919855 LEVARI FACIAS |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 13, 2017 SHERIFF SALE STAYED 06-12-2017 09:47 DENNIS G MATTINSON ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 60717767 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS OF SHERIFF'S SALE AND PROOF OF POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69 (G) FILED DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 10, 2017 PROOF OF MAILING- RULE 69 (G) NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS EXHIBITS ACCEPTED BY: KZ TRANSACTION ID: 60711114 CIVIL RULE 69 (G) |
|
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 19, 2017 WRIT OF LEV FAC AND CHECK SENT TO SHERIFF ON 4-20-17 ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 60486511 WRIT ISSUED |
|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 24, 2017 PLEASE ENTER THE APPEARANCE OF CHASE N. MILLER, ESQUIRE AND THE FIRM MCCABE, WEISBERG & CONWAY, PC AS COUNSEL FOR THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY, N.A., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 60373547 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 17, 2017 WRIT PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 60348833 LEVARI FACIAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.