Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Route 17 Llc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Scanlon, Patrick, against Mumford Jr, Tracy, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
CategoryCourt Of Common Pleas Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
POWER OF ATTORNEY FROM DATE DOCKETED: JULY 13, 2021 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT POA ACCEPTED BY: J TRANSACTION ID: 66757101 POWER OF ATTORNEY FILED |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: JULY 13, 2021 JUDGMENT SATISFIED POA ON 7-12-2021 ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 66757285 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 22, 2020 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ALLOW EXECUTION SIGNED BY SALOMONE, C ON 9-18-2020 ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 65949536 ORDER |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION GRANTED DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 12, 2020 MOTION GRANTED |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 22, 2020 MOTION TO ALLOW EXECUTION ON JUDGMENT HEARD BY SALOMONE, C ON 9-18-2020 - MOTION GRANTED ACCEPTED BY: MBM TRANSACTION ID: 65949536 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
EVENT CONTINUED / RESCHEDULED FOR 1:30 P.M. SAME DATE DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 15, 2020 EVENT CONTINUED / RESCHEDULED |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE 9-15-2020 Reached Mr. Mumford by telephone to let him know the Motion for Friday 9-18-2020 woulld be heard at 1:30 p,m, instead of 2:30 as previously identified. DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 15, 2020 NOTICE |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JULY 25, 2020 RENOTICE OF MOTION AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING ACCEPTED BY: KZ TRANSACTION ID: 65795358 NOTICE |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
EVENT CONTINUED / RESCHEDULED DUE TO COURT EMERGENCY DATE DOCKETED: JULY 14, 2020 EVENT CONTINUED / RESCHEDULED |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 9, 2020 RE-NOTICE OF MOTION AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING ACCEPTED BY: J TRANSACTION ID: 65682811 MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.