Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Estates Of Red Lion Maintenance Corp, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Fornias Iii, Edward J, against Conley, Brett, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
CategoryJustice Of The Peace Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 30, 2016 JUDGMENT SATISFIED ON 3-29-2016 ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 58783341 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 28, 2011 FI FA WAGE ATTACHMENT WRIT RETURNED- SERVED NEW CASTLE COUNTY POLICE DEPT BY SERVING DONNA BEATTIE-WEEKS ON 4-04-11. RETURNED ON 4-12-11. ACCEPTED BY: SJ TRANSACTION ID: 37264249 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 27, 2011 RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR WAGE ATTACHMENT FILED ON APRIL 14, 2011 BY GARY L. STEVENS OF THE OFFICE OF FINANCE, NEW CASTLE COUNTY. ACCEPTED BY: SJ TRANSACTION ID: 37252936 LETTER |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 24, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE WAGE ATT. ISSUED 3-24-11. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 36626174 WRIT ISSUED |
|
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: ATTACHMENT FI FA DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 22, 2011 PLAINTIFF'S WRIT OF ATTACHMENT - FIFA PRAECIPE TO WRIT OF ATTACHMENT - FIFA ACCEPTED BY: MQC TRANSACTION ID: 36561631 ATTACHMENT FIFA |
|
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 28, 2011 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IN AID OF EXECUTION DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT-JUDGMENT DEBTOR; INTERROGATORIES IN AID OF EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT-JUDGMENT DEBTOR ACCEPTED BY: SJ TRANSACTION ID: 36150215 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 30, 2010 TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT AND EXECUTION FOR TRANSFER TO SUPERIOR COURT ACCEPTED BY: CC1 TRANSACTION ID: 35094217 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING JUSTICE OF THE PEACE COURT SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 30, 2010 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: BRETT CONLEY JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $212.00 PLUS $60 COURT COSTS PLUS $250 ATTORNEY FEES WITH 5.75% POST JUDGMENT INTEREST FROM AUGUST 24, 2010. INIT FILING JP COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.