Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Harley-Davidson Financial Services, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kerrick, Daniel C, against Lynch Jr, Robert E, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with HERLIHY, JEROME O presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHERLIHY, JEROME O Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2010 |
CategoryReplevin |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MAY 7, 2011 PLAINTIFF HARLEY-DAVIDSON FINANCIAL'S VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT LYNCH ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 37428760 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 5, 2011 STALL LETTER SENT TO COUNSEL REQUESTING A RESPONSE AS TO THE STATUS OF THE CASE BY MAY 24, 2011 ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 37379387 LETTER |
|
February 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 10, 2011 WRIT RETURNED; NON EST AS TO ROBERT E LYNCH, JR ON 1-20-2011 ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 35840977 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 16, 2011 1 WRIT ISSUED JANUARY 14 2011 ACCEPTED BY: LM TRANSACTION ID: 35399707 WRIT ISSUED |
|
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 15, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY HERLIHY, J. FOR MOTION FOR WRIT OF REPLEVIN TO BE HEARD ON FEBRUARY 22, 2011 AT 9:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 35379669 ORDER |
|
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING REPLEVIN DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 4, 2011 INIT FILING REPLEVIN |
|
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 4, 2011 COMPLAINT IN REPLEVIN AND COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES EXHIBIT A CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT MOTION FOR WRIT OF REPLEVIN ON COMPLAINT IN REPLEVIN AND COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES PROPOSED ORDER SCHEDULING PRESENTATION OF MOTION FOR WRIT OF REPLEVIN PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WRIT OF REPLEVIN PRAECIPE SUMMONS ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 35133434 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.