Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lajoie, Donna, Hart, Anne, Aubee, George A, Garretson, Alvis, Keyes, William, (total of 53) See All filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Kontis, Christina M, Smith, Bryan P, Phillips, Marc J, Della Porta Jr, Armand J, Phillips Jr., John C, (total of 40) See All against Air & Liquid Systems Corp, Trane Us Inc, Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack Of Delaware Inc, Georgia Pacific Llc, Sterling Fluid Systems Usa Llc, (total of 41) See All in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, ASBESTOS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDGE, ASBESTOS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryAsbestos |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 9, 2013 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL OF DAVID W. DEBRUIN, ESQ., FOR PLAINTIFFS AND WITHDRAWAL OF IAN CONNOR BIFFERATO, ESQ. ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 53360313 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 29, 2011 SHERIFF'S RETURN ON GARDNER DENVER INC, IMO INDUSTRIES AND PNEUMO ABEX LLC BY SERVING MARY DRUMMOND REGISTERED AGENT FOR PRENTICE HALL CORPORATION SYSTEM INC ON 01-13-2011. ACCEPTED BY: LAT TRANSACTION ID: 38359531 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MAY 12, 2011 GRANTED (ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS BASED UPON A STIPULATION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL) ACCEPTED BY: MMM TRANSACTION ID: 37519872 ORDER |
|
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
COURT DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MAY 12, 2011 COURT DISMISSAL |
|
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MAY 5, 2011 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT ON THIS 2ND DAY OF MAY, 2011 PLAINTIFFS' SPECIFIC EXHIBIT DISCLOSURES WERE SERVED UPON DEFENSE COORDINATING COUNSEL, LORETO P. RUFO, ESQ. AND ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD VIA LEXISNEXIS. ACCEPTED BY: AJD TRANSACTION ID: 37350336 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST DATE DOCKETED: MAY 5, 2011 PLAINTIFFS' INITIAL WITNESS LIST ACCEPTED BY: AJD TRANSACTION ID: 37350196 WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST |
|
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
EXHIBITS DATE DOCKETED: MAY 5, 2011 EXHIBIT TO PLAINTIFFS' INITIAL WITNESS LIST ACCEPTED BY: AJD TRANSACTION ID: 37350196 EXHIBITS |
|
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MAY 5, 2011 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT ON THIS 2ND DAY OF MAY, 2011, PLAINTIFFS' INITIAL WITNESS LIST WAS SERVED UPON DEFENSE COORDINATING COUNSEL, LORETO P. RUFO, ESQ., AND ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD VIA LEXISNEXIS. ACCEPTED BY: AJD TRANSACTION ID: 37350196 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MAY 5, 2011 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT ON THIS 2ND OF MAY, 2011 PLAINTIFFS' TESTIMONY DISCLOSURE DATED MAY 2, 2011 WAS SERVED UPON DEFENSE COORDINATING COUNSEL, LORETO P. RUFO, ESQ., AND ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD VIA LEXISNEXIS ACCEPTED BY: AJD TRANSACTION ID: 37350041 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MAY 5, 2011 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT ON THIS 2ND DAY OF MAY, 2011, PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBIT DISCLOSURE DATED MAY 2, 2011WAS SERVED UPON DEFENSE COORDINATING COUNSEL, LORETO P. RUFO, ESQ., AND ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD VIA LEXISNEXIS. ACCEPTED BY: AJD TRANSACTION ID: 37349938 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.