Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Runkel, Erin E, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Forcina Jr., Anthony N, Herron, Bruce C, against Stewart, Eugene J, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with STREETT, DIANE C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTREETT, DIANE C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 11, 2011 PROPOSED ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE 10C-12-273-DCS WITH 10C-08-194-FSS, SO ORDERED BY SILVERMAN, J ON 2-8-2011 ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 35872916 ORDER |
|
January 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 22, 2011 PLAINTIFF'S LETTER TO JUDGE SILVERMAN RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACCEPTED BY: JAW TRANSACTION ID: 35509115 LETTER |
|
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
LAST RESPONSIVE PLEADING DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 24, 2011 LAST RESPONSIVE PLEADING |
|
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 20, 2011 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE N10C-08-194 FSS AND N10C-12-273 DCS NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE N10C-08-194 FSS AND N10C-12-273 DCS. THIS MOTION WILL BE PRESENTED TO THE HONORABLE FRED S. SILVERMAN ON FEBRUARY 4, 2011 AT 9 A.M. DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE N10C-08-194 FSS AND N10C-12-273 DCS DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE N10C-08-194 FSS AND N10C-12-273 DCS ACCEPTED BY: JAW TRANSACTION ID: 35381721 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE |
|
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 19, 2011 DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS TO ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES DEFENDANT'S CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF ACCEPTED BY: JAW TRANSACTION ID: 35375071 ANSWER FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES |
|
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 19, 2011 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS TO ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES DEFENDANT'S CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF ACCEPTED BY: JAW TRANSACTION ID: 35375071 ANSWER |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 31, 2010 COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL (LONG ARM) SUMMONS PLAINITIFF'S CIVIL RULE 3(H) STATEMENT PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 35115291 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PERSONAL INJURY AUTO DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 31, 2010 INIT FILING PERS INJURY AUTO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.