Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Porter, Misha, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Radulski, Erin K, O'Neill, Jonathan B, against Geico General Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with STREETT, DIANE C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTREETT, DIANE C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
CategoryAuto Arbitration Appeal |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 28, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: STREETT, DIANECLARKE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL SO ORDERED BY STREETT, J ON 6-24-2011 ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 38348516 ORDER |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 25, 2011 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 38328771 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
LAST RESPONSIVE PLEADING DATE DOCKETED: MAY 26, 2011 LAST RESPONSIVE PLEADING |
|
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 3, 2011 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF ACCEPTED BY: CCM TRANSACTION ID: 36194675 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
February 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 11, 2011 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 35858302 ANSWER |
|
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 9, 2011 WRIT RETURN: SERVED ON GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE CO. BY DELIVERING AND LEAVING IN THE HANDS OF INSURANCE COMMISSIONER ON 01-25-2011 ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 35814445 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 16, 2011 2 WRITS ISSUED JANUARY 13 2011 ACCEPTED BY: LM TRANSACTION ID: 35399681 WRIT ISSUED |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING AUTO ARBITRATION APPEAL DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 31, 2010 INIT FILING AUTO ARB APPEAL |
|
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 31, 2010 PORTER COMPLAINT ON APPEAL PORTER CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE ON APPEAL PORTER NOTICE OF APPEAL PORTER SUMMONS ON APPEAL PORTER FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES PORTER TRANSCRIPT OF THE RECORD ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 35113871 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.