Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Samson, Ellen, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Shields, Colleen D, O'Day Jr., William L, against Marshalls Of Ma, Inc., T J X Companies Inc, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with PARKINS JR., JOHN A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKINS JR., JOHN A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2010 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 4, 2010 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 34162688 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 2, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF COLLEEN D. SHIELDS, ESQUIRE, AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT THE TJX COMPANIES, INC. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF COLLEEN D. SHIELDS, ESQUIRE, AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT THE TJX COMPANIES, INC. ACCEPTED BY: KDC DATE DOCKETED: 02-OCT-2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 3, 2010 FILED BY: AGNEW, SHARON SA WRIT RETURNED, SERVED MARSHALLS OF MA INC AND THE TJX COMPANIES INC. ON 8-24-10. RETURNED 9-2-10. ACCEPTED BY: KDC DATE DOCKETED: 03-SEP-2010 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 18, 2010 FILED BY: AGNEW, SHARON SA 2 WRITS ISSUED AUGUST 16 2010 ACCEPTED BY: LM DATE DOCKETED: 18-AUG-2010 WRIT ISSUED |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PERSONAL INJURY DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 6, 2010 INIT FILING PERSONAL INJURY |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 6, 2010 Complaint Affidavit Pursuant to Rule 3(h)(1)(II) Praecipe Summons Plaintiff's Answers to Form 30 Interrogatories ACCEPTED BY: DATE DOCKETED: 06-AUG-2010 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 6, 2010 Superior Court Civil Case Information Sheet ACCEPTED BY: DATE DOCKETED: 06-AUG-2010 CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.