Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Kent County, DE, . Kent County, DE Superior Courts with CLARK, JEFFREY J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCLARK, JEFFREY J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKent County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 19, 2022 SCHEDULING ORDER; PTC 6-7-23 TCC 7-7-23 3D TRIAL 7-10-23 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67631696 SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MAY 14, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF CARLINA NICKERSON'S NARRATIVE REPORT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67619647 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 7, 2022 LETTER TO COURT REGARDING A 2ND TELE-CONFERENCE FOR A NEW SCHEDULING ORDER, SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, MAY 18, 2022, AT 8:30 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67594941 LETTER |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 5, 2022 LETTER TO COUNSEL REGARDING SCHEUDLING 2ND TELECONFERENCE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67586635 LETTER |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
none. HEARING CONTINUED |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED DATE DOCKETED: MAY 5, 2022 LETTER RE: REQUEST FOR A NEW SCHEDULING ORDER ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67586432 PROPOSED ORDER |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MAY 5, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: CLARK, JEFF SO ORDERED (LETTER RE: REQUEST FOR A NEW SCHEDULING ORDER) ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67586610 ORDER |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 12, 2022 DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE REGARDING DEFENDANT'S AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF INTERROGATORIES ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67387143 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 5, 2022 DEFENDANT HILCO TRANSPORT, INC.'S NOTICE OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY DIRECTED TO DEFENDANTS ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67366791 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 28, 2022 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFFS ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67270088 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.