Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Household Finance Corporation Of California, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hembree, Daniel L., against Badawi, Nader A, represented by Sok, Curtis B., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Robert Oliver presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert Oliver Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2009 |
Category09 Limited - Other Collections Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed | |
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Cabrera, Carlos |
|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Order granting motion to vacate judgment signed by Judge Robert Oliver filed. Judgment entered on 10/19/10 be set aside and vacated. rls Event: Order vacating judgment |
|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Entire action dismissed without prejudice. rls Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Order: to Vacate Judgment Forwarded to: Dept. 21 th. |
|
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration filed Declaration of Plaintiff's Counsel Re: Void Judgments filed. th. |
|
November 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Off calendar for CT scheduled for 03/11/11. Summary Judgment entered. jy | |
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAPRTY on 21-OCT-2010 by SYEPIZ. |
|
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 21-OCT-2010 by SYEPIZ. |
|
October 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order filed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Judge F. Brian Alvarez filed. jy |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.