Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Walsh, Mark D., against Badawi, Nader A, represented by Sok, Curtis B., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hamilton, Jeffrey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHamilton, Jeffrey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 13, 2009 |
Category09 Limited - Other Collections Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed | |
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
August 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $28,265.95. rls | |
August 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued. rls | |
August 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$50.00 was made on receipt CLCE224251. |
|
July 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Memo of costs after judgment Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $0.00 Interest: $260.44 Costs: $250.00 |
|
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Off calendar for CTscheduled for 10/29/10. Judgment entered. jy | |
May 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAPRTY on 03-MAY-2010 by SYEPIZ. |
|
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 30-APR-2010 by SYEPIZ. |
|
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Summary Judgment entered prior to trial and disposing of entire action signed by Judge F. Brian Alvarez filed. It is hereby ordered: Judgment entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant Nader A. Badawi in the sum of: Principal: $20,416.47 Interest: $5,085.04 Attorney Fees: $1,575.00 Costs: $654.00 Total: $27,730.51 jy |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.