We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Hsbc Bank Nevada Na Vs Smith, Mary Ellen Sch

Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago ago

On February 20, 2008 a Collections case was filed by Hsbc Bank Nevada Na, represented by Winn, Brian N, against Smith, Mary Ellen, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County.

Case Details

Filing Date

February 20, 2008

Last Refreshed

February 24, 2021

Filing Location

Amador County, CA

Judge

SWIFT, HUGH K Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Civil - Limited

Practice Area

Creditor

Matter Type

Collections

Case Cycle Time

586 days

Time to First Dissmisal Order

93 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Parties

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Attorneys for Defendants

Case History

Type Description
Docket Event ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED Receipt: 95896 Date: 10/13/2009 BRIAN N WINN (Attorney) on behalf of HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A. (PLAINTIFF)
Docket Event REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR THE AMOUNT OF $1,889.18 ENTERED AS REQUESTED IRWIN J ESKANOS (Attorney) on behalf of HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A. (PLAINTIFF)
Docket Event REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES 1 TO 10 ONLY. DISMISSAL ENTERED AS REQUESTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.
Docket Event ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED IRWIN J ESKANOS (Attorney) on behalf of HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A. (PLAINTIFF) Receipt: 75653 Date: 07/03/2008
Docket Event CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET
Docket Event SUMMONS ISSUED & FILED
Docket Event NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN DELAY REDUCTION
Docket Event ATTORNEY CHANGE: Attorney WINN, BRIAN N representing PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A. as of 08/18/2009
Docket Event ATTORNEY CHANGE: Attorney ESKANOS, IRWIN J dismissed/withdrawn for PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A. on 08/17/2009
Docket Event SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY BRIAN N WINN (Attorney) on behalf of HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A. (PLAINTIFF)
See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.