We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Farmers Insurance Exchange ,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
against
Tricia Mary Marie Gonzalez ,
Elizabeth Lopez Hernandez ,
Clarissa L Hernandez ,
in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
This case was filed in
Orange County
Superior Courts
.
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions
288 days
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Case Cycle Time
2245 days
Plaintiffs
Farmers Insurance Exchange
Defendants
Tricia Mary Marie Gonzalez
Elizabeth Lopez Hernandez
Case Events for
Farmers Insurance Exchange v. Tricia Mary Marie Gonzalez
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
July 01, 2013
Docket Event
CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.
March 27, 2008
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 1.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10082759 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 107126.
Get Document
February 21, 2008
Docket Event
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 02/21/2008
Get Document
February 21, 2008
Docket Event
CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSAL
December 11, 2007
Docket Event
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HERNANDEZ, CLARISSA L; HERNANDEZ, ELIZABETH LOPEZ ON 12/11/2007
December 11, 2007
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED FOR 32 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 300.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10014436 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 38848.
December 11, 2007
Docket Event
PAYMENT RECEIVED FOR 32 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 300.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10014439 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 38851.
October 12, 2007
Docket Event
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE (NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS) WAS FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 10/12/2007
July 13, 2007
Docket Event
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY ELIZABETH HERNANDEZ ON 07/13/2007
May 30, 2007
Docket Event
PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 05/30/2007
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.