Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Robinson, Rosalie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Robinson, Rashad, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION, JUDGE Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution - Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions173 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time173 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment filmed returned-FL Family Law Judgment Date:09/12/2007 Microfilm date:10/11/2007 Microfilm Roll Number:375 |
|
September 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment Status Only Judgment (status only) - marital status ends 12/17/2007. rkb 9/12/2007 |
|
September 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of judgment filed. rkb 9/12/2007 | |
September 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Decl Serv Disc Inc & Expense Petitioner's preliminary and waiver of Final. rkb 9/12/2007 |
|
September 12, 2007 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: Archives (for microfilming of Judgment) rkb 9/12/2007 | |
September 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Dissolution (status only) _x__ Legal Separation ___ rkb 9/12/2007 Event: Decl Default Uncontested Disso |
|
September 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case comment Copies of Judgments and relevant documents sent out per envelopes provided to respective parties. rkb 9/12/2007 |
|
August 20, 2007 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: DCSS check 8-20-07 skc | |
August 20, 2007 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: FLEX Plaza Bldg 8-20-07 skc | |
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: Self-Help Center for Judgment 8-15-07 cb |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.