Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bleier, Elizabeth A, against Weir, Connie M, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SWIFT, HUGH K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSWIFT, HUGH K Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions104 days |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3766 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE DESTROYED | |
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSED FOR ___________ COUNTY RETURNED AND FILED WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSED FOR EL DORADO COUNTY RETURNED AND FILED |
|
November 24, 2008 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (FULL) ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK (PLAINTIFF) | |
November 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSED FOR ___________ COUNTY RETURNED AND FILED WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSED FOR MARSHAL COUNTY RETURNED AND FILED WITH MEMORANDUM OF GARNISHEE ATTACHED ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK (PLAINTIFF) |
|
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ___________ COUNTY WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED - AMADOR ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK (PLAINTIFF) Receipt: 78865 Date: 09/17/2008 |
|
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST COSTS $79.00 - CREDITS $602.04 - INTEREST $107.93 ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK (PLAINTIFF) | |
September 02, 2008 | Docket Event | SUBMITTED DOCUMENTS RETURNED: MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, WRIT-- ITEM H OF MEMO OF COSTS INCOMPLETE | |
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK (PLAINTIFF) | |
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ___________ COUNTY WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED, COUNTY OF EL DORADO Receipt: 68350 Date: 02/01/2008 |
|
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED Receipt: 67706 Date: 01/17/2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.