Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hughes, Philip R, Olsen, Mary J., Mcphail, Jennifer Louise, Cervantes, Olivia, Dias, Elizabeth J., (total of 34) See All filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCONVERSION, JUDGE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryOther Probate With No Hearing |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$20.00 was made on receipt PRCE39182. |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion 3rd Amended Affidavit re Real Property of Small Value; lv063008 Event: Real property affidavit |
|
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Amended document filed 2nd Amended Affidavit Re Real Property of Small Value filed. cd 5-9-08 |
|
February 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Amended Affidavit RE Real Property of Small Value. tl 022508 Event: Real property affidavit |
|
December 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$80.00 was made on receipt PRCE31156. |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$20.00 was made on receipt PRCE31120. |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$20.00 was made on receipt PRCE31138. |
|
December 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Affidavit Re Real Property of Small Value-Decedent David Lancaster jla 12-06-06 Event: Real property affidavit |
|
December 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Affidavit Re Real Property of Small Value jla 12-05-06 Event: Real property affidavit |
|
December 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Affidavit Re Real Property of Small Value-Decedent Emma Lancaster jla 12-06-06 Event: Real property affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.