Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Badwal, Gurcharan, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gregory A Meredith, against Singh, Karnail, M S Apn Construction Company, Chitti, Karnail Singh, represented by Michael R Locks, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Ret Doc-OX rejected..defendant's name does not match judgment
Date: 2008-01-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (In support of motion to vacate) filed.
Date: 2008-05-30T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion (to vacate and set aside judgment) filed.
Date: 2008-06-11T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor filed.
Date: 2008-03-20T00:00:00Reply - Other (to plaintiff's response) filed.
Date: June 23, 2008Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: 2007-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2007-11-28T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2008-06-13T00:00:00CMP Packet
Date: 2007-10-31T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Order of Examination - OX Calendar heard on 05/14/2008 08:15:00 AM .
Date: 2008-05-14T00:00:00Motion to Vacate (And Setting Aside Default Judgment) filed.
Date: 2008-05-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Karnail Singh in support of motion for relief from the default) filed.
Date: 2008-05-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-04-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2008-05-07T00:00:00Returned Document(the party named on the Abstract must match to the judgment)issued 1/09/2008
Date: 2008-01-09T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-01-14T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (Returned After Hearing) filed.
Date: 2008-01-10T00:00:00Returned Document Form - Answer
Date: 2008-06-13T00:00:00Writ of Execution
Date: August 06, 2008Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: October 28, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.