Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The Regents Of The University Of California, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Law Office Of Phillip M Cunningham, against The Charter Group, Llc, The Charter Group Alliance, Llc, The Charter Group Alliance, Percell, Lloyd E., Cirkel, Harry L., (total of 5) See All represented by Law Offices Of J. Peter Gyben, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Kevin R. Culhane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin R. Culhane Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Motion - Other (for entry of judgment pursuant to terms of stipulated settlement) filed.
Date: 2010-05-11T00:00:00Amended Judgment By Court On Stipulation
Date: August 23, 2010Motion - Other (for Entry of Judgment pursuant to the terms of stipulated settlement) filed.
Date: 2010-04-08T00:00:00Judgment
Date: June 29, 2010Declaration - Other (Phillip M Cunningham in support of motion for entry of judgment) filed.
Date: 2010-05-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Phillip M Cunningham in support of the Motionfor entry of judgment) filed.
Date: 2010-04-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of motion for entry of judgment) filed.
Date: 2010-05-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/27/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-04-27T00:00:00Clerkyyys Return Document Letter
Date: 2008-04-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.