Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Prater, Amanda, Alvarez, Lisa, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Clayeo C Arnold, against Murphy, Jessica, Murphy, Elizabeth, Andrade, Jasmine Elaine, Andrade Jr, Ronald, represented by Wayne M Collins, Steven J Plas, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: February 22, 2008Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: April 02, 2008Court Review of Settlement
Date: April 11, 2008Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: April 01, 2008Judgment - Offer to Compromise filed.
Date: 2008-01-09T00:00:00Judgment on acceptance of CCP section 998 offer
Date: January 11, 2008Notice - Other (acceptance of offer to compromise) filed.
Date: 2008-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Trial filed.
Date: 2008-01-07T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Court Review of Settlement | |
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement filed. | |
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement filed. | |
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 04/29/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated . | |
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 04/01/2008 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated . | |
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed. | |
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment entered . | |
January 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 04/01/2008 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated . | |
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment on acceptance of CCP section 998 offer | |
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 04/29/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.