Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hamner, Sonnie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by John E Virga Inc, against Ostantnik, Thomas, Rex Moore Electrical Contractors Engineers, Inc., represented by Porter Scott Weiberg & Delehant, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2006 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Correspondence (Letter-GRANTED Request to appear by telephone at MSC) filed.
Date: 2008-03-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: July 18, 2008Correspondence (Letter - GRANTED Request to Appear by Telephone) filed.
Date: June 25, 2008ORDER DETERMINING DISPOSITION OF EXPARTE AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS
Date: 2008-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Entry of Order) filed.
Date: 2008-04-08T00:00:00Stipulation for Settlement
Date: June 26, 2008Notice of Trial filed.
Date: 2008-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: July 21, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.